HIGH LITTLETON PRE-SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1026266
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/Training Children/Young People Provides Services (eg care/counselling)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022

Total income: £88,267
Total expenditure: £114,888

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1993: Standard registration
  • 23 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 23 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1037250 Farmborough Pre-school
  • 23 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1025259 CLUTTON PLAYGROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BO-PEEP PRE-SCHOOL HIGH LITTLETON (Working name)
  • BO-PEEP PLAYGROUP HIGH LITTLETON (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £88.79k £99.00k £99.26k £110.68k £88.27k
Total expenditure £81.15k £97.00k £95.70k £111.51k £114.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £80.58k £88.89k N/A
Income from government grants £73.60k £73.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 19 May 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 10 February 2022 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 10 February 2022 255 days late
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 November 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 November 2020 158 days late