FRIENDS OF GUNTHORPE PARISH CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money by way of community events and gatherings which are used towards the upkeep of the fabric of St Mary's Parish Church, Gunthorpe, Norfolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE MELICK VALK DENHOLM | Chair | 28 May 1993 |
|
|
||||
David Albert Godin | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Marsden | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANE CARWARDINE | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Hammond | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hugh Redmayne | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|||||
PIPPA BUNTING | Trustee | 28 May 1993 |
|
|
||||
MR JEREMY DENHOLM | Trustee | 28 May 1993 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BLAKELEY | Trustee | 28 May 1993 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.91k | £24.77k | £3.37k | £4.74k | £6.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £1.91k | £3.87k | £5.98k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 28TH MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY, GUNTHORPE, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GUNTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gunthorpe Hall
Hall Lane
Gunthorpe
MELTON CONSTABLE
NR24 2PA
- Phone:
- 02083321777
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window