JACK AND JILL (MILTON) PRESCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jack & Jill (Milton) Pre-school provides care for 48 children from two to five years and offers a well organised and productive environment for children who take part in an extensive range of interesting and stimulating learning experiences
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £102,801 from 102801 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 22 September 1993: Standard registration
- JACK AND JILL (MILTON) PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Brooming | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charmaine Greggory | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Chaffin | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Anstey | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Emma Costello | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.88k | £116.10k | £140.29k | £160.80k | £127.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.17k | £126.40k | £130.17k | £160.38k | £152.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £106.35k | N/A | £140.89k | £102.80k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £130.17k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shelford Road
Southsea
Porstmouth
Porstmouth
hampshire
PO4 8NU
- Phone:
- 02392830040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window