Financial history THE JULIA MARGARET CAMERON TRUST

Charity number: 1026339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £246.54k £234.14k £159.32k £122.12k £122.68k
Total expenditure £139.24k £137.74k £150.76k £112.06k £133.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £71.01k N/A N/A £1.08k