THE JULIA MARGARET CAMERON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educate the public in the work of Julia Margaret Cameron, including the history of photography, and appreciation of modern photography as an art Encourage & promote awareness & knowledge of the historic Freshwater Circle & conservation of the Tennyson Mile Advance education & knowledge of the links from Julia Margaret Cameron's time in the significant milestones occurring since within West Wight
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £1,075 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 21 September 1993: Standard registration
- DIMBOLA LODGE (Working name)
- DIMBOLA LODGE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BRIAN JOHN COLES HINTON MBE | Chair |
|
||||||
Jennifer Osborne | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SIMMONDS | Trustee | 04 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GIDDINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.54k | £234.14k | £159.32k | £122.12k | £122.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.24k | £137.74k | £150.76k | £112.06k | £133.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £71.01k | N/A | N/A | £1.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 February 2025 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
13 February 2025 | 289 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/08/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/01/2013
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE AT DIMBOLA LODGE, FRESHWATER IN THE ISLE OF WIGHT AN EDUCATIONAL CENTRE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WORK OF JULIA MARGARET CAMERON AND THE HISTORY OF EARLY PHOTOGRAPHY, AND THE PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF MODERN PHOTOGRAPHY AS AN ART. (II) TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE AWARENESS AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE HISTORIC FRESHWATER CIRCLE AND CONSERVATION OF THE AREA KNOWN AS FRESHWATER MILE. (III) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE LINKS FROM JULIA MARGARET CAMERON'S TIME TO THE PRESENT DAY THROUGH OUR OUTREACH PHILOSOPHY REFLECTING THE RICH ARTISTIC, SOCIAL & CULTURAL DIVERSITY ADHERENT BOTH DURING HER TIME ON THE ISLAND, AND IN SIGNIFICANT MILESTONES OCCURRING SINCE WITHIN WEST WIGHT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIMBOLA LODGE
TERRACE LANE
FRESHWATER BAY
ISLE OF WIGHT
PO40 9QE
- Phone:
- 07583078807
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window