Financial history FRANCIS BAILY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1026341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £33.50k £34.46k £16.17k £21.31k £29.67k
Total expenditure £34.38k £24.53k £29.58k £16.33k £26.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A