HOME SUPPORT ELMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HSE was established as a charity in 1989 to provide a comprehensive and flexible household support service in order to promote independent living for those residents of Elmbridge needing such a service as a result of age or disability; also, where possible, to subsidise the service financially in cases of financial need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,090 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 September 1993: Standard registration
- MDHS HOUSEHOLD SERVICES (Previous name)
- MOLESEY AND DITTON'S HOUSEWORK SCHEME (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Joy Elmer | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jerry Mills | Trustee | 18 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.69k | £63.96k | £66.65k | £68.51k | £57.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.27k | £72.31k | £62.00k | £56.50k | £58.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.09k | £3.09k | £3.09k | £3.09k | £3.09k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/06/1993 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMPREHENSIVE AND FLEXIBLE HOUSEHOLD SUPPORT SERVICE IN ORDER TO PROMOTE INDEPENDENT LIVING FOR THOSE NEEDING SUCH A SERVICE AS A RESULT OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY. ALSO WHERE POSSIBLE TO SUBSIDISE THE SERVICE FINANCIALLY IN CASE OF FINANCIAL NEED.
Area of benefit
POSTAL DISTRICTS OF THAMES DITTON, LONG DITTON, EAST MOLESEY, WEST MOLESEY AND HINCHLEY WOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHARITY HOUSE
1& 2 The Quintet
Churchfield Road
WALTON-ON-THAMES
KT12 2TZ
- Phone:
- 01932267128
- Email:
- hs.elmbridge@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window