BARNSLEY THEATRE TRUST (1998) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the trust is to promote and advance theatrical arts within and for the entire community of Barnsley and the surrounding area. The principal activity is that of promoting, maintaining, improving and advancing education particularly by the promotion and production of the arts in Barnsley.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnsley
Governance
- 22 September 1993: Standard registration
- THE LAMPROOM THEATRE (Working name)
- BARNSLEY THEATRE ROYAL TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN NOEL KELLY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Caile | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chantele Smith | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dean Ryan Love | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Miccoli | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN HEY | Trustee | 12 March 1998 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER WALTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £362.33k | £283.11k | £128.07k | £328.03k | £408.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £299.18k | £262.04k | £185.32k | £369.68k | £406.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.40k | £68.11k | £13.35k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 August 2022 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/02/2015 as amended on 15 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO THE DRAMATIC ARTS IN THE DISTRICT OF BARNSLEY AND ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
BARNSLEY AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAMP ROOM THEATRE
WESTGATE
BARNSLEY
S70 2DX
- Phone:
- 01226249611
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window