SURREY BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering the craft of beekeeping.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB MAURER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Mayne | Trustee | 03 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Futcher | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Katherine Hunter | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martyn John Milner | Trustee | 07 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Geoffrey Clarke | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Denys Bradfield | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen William Derry | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSALIND TRACEY MIST | Trustee | 02 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Hogarth | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
PENNY MCMAHON | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.64k | £163.72k | £138.83k | £194.10k | £187.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.48k | £152.99k | £111.54k | £138.47k | £166.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 3 NOVEMBER 1956 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 1964, 26 APRIL 1975, 24 APRIL 1976, 24 APRIL 1993, 30 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 5 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING AND THE SCIENCE OF BEES AND THEIR PATHOGENS, FOR THE PUBLIC GOOD TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ENVIRONMENTAL AND ECONOMIC IMPORTANCE OF BEES AND, AS AN AREA ASSOCIATION MEMBER OF THE BRITISH BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION, TO RENDER SUCH ASSISTANCE IN THE PURSUIT OF ITS OBJECTIVES AS MAY BE NECESSARY
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Esher Road
EAST MOLESEY
KT8 0AH
- Phone:
- 07764804323
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window