FRIENDS OF SWIMBRIDGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Raffles, Fayres, Community Events, School Discos, Bingo and Craft Afternoons, to raise funds for the school and associated educational outings/events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 August 2024

Total income: £6,233
Total expenditure: £6,227

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SWIMBRIDGE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samuel Whitton Chair 09 October 2024
None on record
Leah Mahoney Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Claire Holme Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Johanna Louise Johnson Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023 30/08/2024
Total gross income £2.41k £3.05k £2.66k £2.71k £6.23k
Total expenditure £1.93k £2.51k £1.97k £3.02k £6.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2022 08 July 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2021 08 July 2023 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 21 March 2022 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Swimbridge C of E Primary School
Swimbridge
Barnstaple Hill
Barnstaple
Devon
EX32 0PJ
Phone:
01271830437
Website:

No information available