Accounts and annual returns UNITY PARISH OF CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity Number: 1026481
Charity reporting is overdue by 1119 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 388 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 388 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 754 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 754 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1119 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1119 days
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 September 2021 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required