Financial history UNITY PARISH OF CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1026481
Charity reporting is overdue by 1124 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £44.52k £30.97k £3.00k £13.82k £7.12k
Total expenditure £31.79k £22.76k £14.76k £16.87k £22.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A