Governing document FAIRFIELD (CROYDON) LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JANUARY 1993, AS AMENDED 23 MARCH 1993 AND AS AMENDED 15 APRIL 1993 AND 16 NOVEMBER 1995, 30 JULY 1998 AND 26 NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS BY PROVIDING, MANAGING AND MAKING AVAILABLE A THEATRE, CINEMA, ART GALLERY, PUBLIC HALL AND RECREATION CENTRE, PROVIDED THAT ALL OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE OF A CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.