OASIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1026487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Oasis Charitable Trust is a family of organisations running community Hubs providing holistic support to the communities we serve. Our work includes our Academies programme, youthwork, Chaplaincy services & churches, anti human traffiking campaigning through STOP THE TRAFFIK, Higher Education courses through Oasis College and supported housing through Oasis Aquila Housing.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 September 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FAITHWORKS (Working name)
  • OASIS UK (Working name)
  • STOP THE TRAFFIK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Mapp Trustee 13 May 2024
THE MAPP CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
L'ARCHE
Received: On time
Harry Phinda Trustee 13 May 2024
None on record
Clare Heard Trustee 13 May 2024
None on record
Ola Kolade Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Christine Lesley Morgan Trustee 26 January 2022
None on record
Robert Beckford Trustee 13 January 2021
None on record
Caroline Mary Taylor Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Mark Francis McAllister Trustee 11 July 2017
OASIS COLLEGE OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Received: On time
PHILIP WARLAND Trustee 12 September 2016
None on record
JANICE ANN SMITH Trustee 12 September 2016
THE BOYS' BRIGADE - LONDON DISTRICT
Received: On time
NICHOLAS WILLIAM SALISBURY Trustee 30 January 2013
OASIS AQUILA HOUSING
Received: On time
DAVID FRANCIS BRIGHT Trustee 16 August 2011
OASIS COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIPS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £473.78k £1.09m £238.27m £250.59m £277.27m
Total expenditure £509.88k £1.13m £239.03m £263.76m £277.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £210.28m £223.10m £229.70m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £619.83k £19.52m £15.22m £3.25m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £2.90m £3.58m £4.30m
Income - Charitable activities N/A £471.98k £215.81m £231.44m £267.53m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £209 £32.00k £347.00k £2.20m
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £20.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £1.13m £237.88m £261.31m £274.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £952.00k £2.22m £2.59m
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.95k £402.00k £293.00k £392.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £200.00k £229.00k £281.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets N/A £0 £0 £376.81m £372.93m
Long-term investments N/A £0 £379.50m £0 £0
Other assets N/A £315.25k £63.98m £73.69m £80.02m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A £0 -£130.46m -£14.25m -£4.07m
Total liabilities N/A £153.34k £30.93m £33.88m £34.67m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Oasis Centre
1A Kennington Road
LONDON
SE1 7QP
Phone:
02079214200
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available