Accounts and annual returns WILLOW TREE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026498
Charity reporting is overdue by 824 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
Annual return 07 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 459 days
Annual return 07 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 824 days
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 824 days
Annual return 07 April 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2021 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 07 April 2020 20 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2020 17 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window