COMMUNITY COLLEGE ASSOCIATION (BISHOP'S CASTLE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds to purchase equipment for Bishops Castle Community College, and to support curriculum evenings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Powys
- Shropshire
Governance
- 27 September 1993: Standard registration
- 12 April 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | 31/10/2005 | 31/10/2006 | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £482 | £1.96k | £298 | £389 | £157 | |
|
Total expenditure | £796 | £2.14k | £87 | £613 | £3.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 08 February 2011 | 526 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 04 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS/STUDENTS OF THE COLLEGE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SOUTH SHROPSHIRE AND POWYS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window