Financial history GORING AND WOODCOTE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FUND

Charity Number: 1026592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.58k £1.78k £885 £1.10k £2.07k
Total expenditure £2.09k £1.45k £1.80k £1.43k £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A