GORING AND WOODCOTE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aim of the Goring & Woodcote Medical Equipment Fund is to provide additional medical equipment for use by the doctors and nurses at the Practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
Governance
- 29 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Roberts | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Pettitt | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Michael Warmingham | Trustee | 24 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW GOODE | Trustee | 20 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.58k | £1.78k | £885 | £1.10k | £2.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.09k | £1.45k | £1.80k | £1.43k | £1.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PERSONS RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR AND REPLACEMENT OF FACILITIES, MEDICAL AND OTHER EQUIPMENT, NURSING AND NURSING AID USED IN THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH PERSONS NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY OR IMMEDIATELY AVAILABLE FROM THE LOCAL HEALTH AUTHORITY
Area of benefit
WITHIN 5 MILES RADIUS OF PARISH CHURCHES OF GORING AND WOODCOTE
Contact information
- Address:
-
GORING & WOODCOTE MEDICAL PRACTICE
RED CROSS ROAD
GORING
READING
RG8 9HG
- Phone:
- 01491680686
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window