Accounts and annual returns WENTWORTH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 March 2025 262 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 24 March 2025 267 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 March 2025 628 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 16 July 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 July 2022 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required