FRIENDS OF WARESIDE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise money through school and village events and sponsorship to purchase resources for the school and children. Recent fundraising has bought Interactive whiteboards, refreshed the school library and built an outdoor "classroom".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Evans | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £376 | £1.44k | £89 | £881 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.06k | £2.14k | £63 | £165 | £526 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 314 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 680 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1045 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1410 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 April 2021 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Kingham Road
Wareside
WARE
SG12 7SB
- Phone:
- 01920318416
- Email:
- kellevans16@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window