INNER WHEEL CLUB OF DONCASTER ST LEGER BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charity donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Doncaster
Governance
- 30 September 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Harbon | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary fawcett | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANN GRANTHAM | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.59k | £6.18k | £2.86k | £3.88k | £5.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £6.61k | £2.78k | £3.70k | £5.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 22 NOVEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED 26 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITY AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE FUND SHALL THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tithe Barn Cottage
Tithes Lane
Tickhill
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN11 9QN
- Phone:
- 01302 752522
- Email:
- Gillianfawcett15@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window