Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF STAFFORD CASTLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1026624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £44.16k £33.88k £53.42k £48.34k £61.29k
Total expenditure £33.47k £19.93k £38.45k £48.29k £57.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A