LOVER AND REDLYNCH PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LOVER AND REDLYNCH PRE-SCHOOL PROVIDES CARE AND EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN FROM 2 YEARS OLD TO SCHOOL AGE. DURING TERM TIME WE PROVIDE 5 MORNING SESSIONS AND 4 AFTERNOON SESSIONS WITH AN OPTION FOR LUNCH CLUB. THE PRE-SCHOOL IS RUN BY A VOLUNTARY COMMITTEE AND EMPLOYS 6 MEMBERS OF STAFF.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £49,021 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 September 1993: Standard registration
- LOVER COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Burton | Chair | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Emmins | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Upton | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.18k | £46.80k | £75.14k | £60.45k | £68.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.62k | £50.41k | £62.75k | £69.59k | £65.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £49.02k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.85k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 22 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JUNE 1993, AS AMENDED ON 30TH APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lover & Redlynch Pre School
School Road
Lover
SALISBURY
SP5 2PW
- Phone:
- 01725510295
- Email:
- lover.preschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window