CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing activities for those persons who are no longer in full-time employment. Groups, tutored and self-help, study and take part in classes in many subjects, dance, exercise, musical, dramatic sessions. The emphasis is on shared learning. The activities undertaken by members of this U3A are self-supporting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
190 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 30 September 1993: Standard registration
- U3A CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Anna Gladman | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Butchers | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Howard Kolsteren | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Frederick Stone | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Francis Wetherell | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lourdes Arrow | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Stuart Terry | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Peel | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Tippett | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Jon WATSON | Trustee | 29 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.65k | £25.61k | £25.87k | £54.40k | £56.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.91k | £19.98k | £35.30k | £45.71k | £52.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF THE MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN CANTERBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY 2) THE PROVISION OF FACITLITIES FOR LEISURE-TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CANTERBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
U3A Canterbury & District
Princes House
8 Orange Street
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 2JA
- Phone:
- 01227 634569
- Email:
- chair@u3acanterbury.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window