Trustees CANTERBURY AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1026681

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Anna Gladman | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Butchers | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Howard Kolsteren | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Frederick Stone | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Francis Wetherell | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Lourdes Arrow | Trustee | 13 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Stuart Terry | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Peel | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Tippett | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Jon WATSON | Trustee | 29 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.