AMITABHA KADAMPA MEDITATION CENTRE (KMC) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching Buddhist meditation and practice to all. Providing place of worship to Buddhists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 September 1993: Standard registration
- AMITABHA CENTRE (Working name)
- Kadampa Meditation Centre Bristol (Working name)
- AMITABHA BUDDHIST CENTRE (Previous name)
- AMITABHA BUDDIST CENTRE (Previous name)
- AMITABHA KADAMPA MEDITATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Cansdale | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Franco | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justin Rodway Mr | Trustee | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.96k | £107.52k | £6.50k | £96.14k | £112.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.32k | £70.53k | £70.66k | £77.28k | £87.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 October 2020 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 AUGUST 1992 AS AMENDED 26 APRIL 1993, 25 JUNE 1994, 28 JANUARY 1995, 30 JUNE 1999, 26 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 14 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 JUL 2017 as amended on 16 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE ALL WITHIN THE MAHAYANA BUDDHIST TRADITION OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA AS TAUGHT BY VENERABLE GESHE KELSANG GYATSO, THE FOUNDER OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION, THROUGH THE CONTINUOUS IMPLEMENTATION OF THE THREE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION STUDY PROGRAMMES: THE GENERAL PROGRAMME, THE FOUNDATION PROGRAMME, AND THE TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMME, ALL AS DEFINED IN SCHEDULE A OF THE MEMORANDUM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLD VICARAGE
GLOUCESTER ROAD
BISHOPSTON
BRISTOL
BS7 8NX
- Phone:
- 01179745160
- Email:
- info@meditationinbristol.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window