Financial history NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR THE TRAINING OF JOURNALISTS

Charity number: 1026685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.34m £3.86m £7.69m £1.89m £1.96m
Total expenditure £3.38m £3.14m £8.16m £2.19m £2.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £431.81k £2.73m £6.56m £530.78k £437.48k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £848.92k £1.04m £1.01m £1.08m £1.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29.97k £19.39k £37.12k £126.50k £132.19k
Income - Other £24.49k £69.21k £83.12k £146.31k £114.59k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.37m £3.12m £8.13m £2.17m £2.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.46k £20.82k £26.30k £23.60k £26.98k
Expenditure - Governance £13.96k £12.88k £16.63k £20.58k £20.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.91m £1.40m £6.40m £199.56k £373.55k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.85k £0 £0 £0 £0