FAIRWAYS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FAIRWAYS PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP PROVIDES PRE SCHOOL NURSERY CARE FOR 2 TO 5 YEAR OLDS, IT IS OFSTED REGULATED AND WORKS CLOSELY WITH THE PRE SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.IT PROVIDES LEARNING, SOCIAL AND A VARIETY OF OTHER SKILLS TO PREPARE CHILDREN FOR SCHOOL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 01 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Dawton | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Moss | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Oborne-Church | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aneliya Brown | Trustee | 02 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Collin | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bowdidge | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Hannah Malkin-Wood | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
KELLY HOULDER-GREENWAY | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATIE DORE | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
LESA PHILIP | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.72k | £162.95k | £188.30k | £180.20k | £183.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.13k | £145.99k | £168.82k | £173.07k | £180.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/10/1985
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LEIGH ON SEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairways Pre School Playgroup
c/o Fairways Primary School
The Fairway
Leigh on Sea
Essex
SS9 4QW
- Phone:
- 01702 421180
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window