EPSOM CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CHORAL PERFORMANCES WEDDINGS FUNERALS LOCAL CHARITY EVENTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Weller | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynfa Landauer | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Rachel Clare Le Prevost | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stella Elizabeth Baylis | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karan Humphries | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.86k | £3.11k | £10.26k | £21.63k | £20.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.66k | £2.64k | £9.88k | £18.67k | £14.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH JULY 1993 as amended on 08 May 2023
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER AND ASSIST IN THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OFHE BOROUGH OF EPSOM AND EWELL AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE STUDY AND REHEARSAL OF CHORAL AND OTHER MUSIC BY PROMOTING AND PARTICIPATING IN ITS PUBLIC PERFORMANCE BY SUPPORTING AND TAKING PART IN MUSIC FESTIVALS AND BY OTHER ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO THAT PURPOSE
Area of benefit
THE BOROUGH OF EPSOM AND EWELL AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Walters Mead
ASHTEAD
Surrey
KT21 2BP
- Phone:
- 07949033538
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window