Accounts and annual returns THE ALL SAINTS CHURCH WING CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1026750
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required