Accounts and annual returns STOKE GOLDINGTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1026756
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 12 August 2024 43 days late
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 25 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 July 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 05 July 2022 5 days late
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 07 July 2021 7 days late
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 May 2020 On Time