Financial history STOKE GOLDINGTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1026756
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £101.53k £83.49k £79.33k £86.60k £75.15k
Total expenditure £100.73k £87.33k £84.54k £88.04k £71.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £41.81k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £78.20k £53.92k N/A £59.95k £45.23k