ELMHURST SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1026767
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for Elmhurst School Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income: £1,618
Total expenditure: £4,450
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Somerset
Governance
Registration history:
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
- 20 March 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.76k | £5.64k | £2.19k | £579 | £1.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.81k | £1.62k | £3.23k | £1.35k | £4.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Submit annual return
Open in new window
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1991 AND AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window