Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL (TWICKENHAM)

Charity Number: 1026779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £135.49k £79.73k £103.22k £110.73k £118.90k
Total expenditure £108.09k £93.07k £86.34k £110.65k £111.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A