Financial history CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, FRAMLINGHAM

Charity number: 1026783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.28k £3.70k £3.42k £2.92k £4.16k
Total expenditure £3.71k £1.85k £2.19k £3.31k £2.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A