Financial history JUMPSTART PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1026786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £57.91k £67.69k £87.14k £95.68k £86.22k
Total expenditure £54.45k £72.81k £77.60k £89.56k £83.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A