JUMPSTART PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-school education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
- JUMPSTART PRE SCHOOL (Working name)
- WALNUT TREE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shabana Mehmood | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shabana Bhukari | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tomas Plaskoicis | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Whitmore | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy McNally | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bilkis Allan | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Mackrill | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.91k | £67.69k | £87.14k | £95.68k | £86.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.45k | £72.81k | £77.60k | £89.56k | £83.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 363 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2024 | 728 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2024 | 728 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2024 | 1093 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2024 | 1093 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1664 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 22 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY; (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF SUCH NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS; (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 WADESMILL LANE
WALNUT TREE
MILTON KEYNES
MK7 7ED
- Phone:
- 01908232296
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window