GUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medical research into early detection of bowel cancers Screening Counselling and running a clinic Grants for medical research into bowel cancers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
- G U T S (Working name)
- GUILDFORD UNDETECTED TUMOUR SCREENING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAIN JOURDAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Anisha Patel | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Read | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Wells | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dena Dixon | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Scala | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jayne White | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILL DAVIS | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MATHEW SHARPE | Trustee | 23 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROF. TIM ROCKALL | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN FRENCH STEBBING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.14k | £167.75k | £125.64k | £78.87k | £370.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.96k | £84.30k | £88.71k | £121.31k | £133.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2021 | 262 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 29 JANUARY 1999 AND 5 DECEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED ON 04 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY SCREENING AND UNDERTAKING OR ASSISTING IN THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH FOR THE EARLY DETECTION AND TREATMENT OF CANCER AND OTHER DISEASES OF THE DIGESTIVE SYSTEM AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SURREY WEST SUSSEX AND HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nerissa Deeks
Royal Surrey County Hospital
Egerton Road
GUILDFORD
GU2 7XX
- Phone:
- 01483408316
- Email:
- nerissa.deeks@nhs.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window