PLAXTOL SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists with the education of children and also provides sporting opportunities and entertainment for the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cassandra Money | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Harris | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Evans | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Edward Kenneth Graham | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ward | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Shorter | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Rust | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Merran Hilton | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Ann Johnson | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.56k | £15.10k | £12.18k | £14.62k | £16.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.02k | £25.33k | £7.88k | £13.45k | £17.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1987 AND AMENDED 11 MAY 1993 as amended on 23 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, AND ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES, OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plaxtol Primary School
School Lane
Plaxtol
SEVENOAKS
Kent
TN15 0QD
- Phone:
- 01732810200
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window