Financial history SAINT ANNES LONGSIGHT (ROYTON) BUILDING COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1026843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.67k £2.30k £168 £149 £149
Total expenditure £6.29k £2.68k £513 £375 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A