FINGRINGHOE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local village Women's Institute Group - Charitable activities for local community and parish.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 06 October 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN LILIAN CHAMBERLAIN | Chair | 10 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Smith-Strevens | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Mitch | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Rowley Davies | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Elizabeth Parkinson | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Guelda Naylor | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Margaret Bellinger | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN BYHAM | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE SUSAN GIBBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £918 | £1.14k | £2.17k | £4.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01k | £965 | £1.23k | £1.14k | £3.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
FINGRINGHOE LANGENHOE AND COLCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
IRISES
BALLAST QUAY ROAD
FINGRINGHOE
COLCHESTER
CO5 7DB
- Phone:
- 07974928878
- Email:
- sueannescott@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window