Trustees STONEBROOM PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1026865

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anisha Eccleshare | Chair | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Taylor | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Owen | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Spafford | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Kathrine Eyley-Jones | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
HELENA LATHAM | Trustee | 06 November 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.