Wildground Federation Parent, Teacher and Friends Association (PTFA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising activities to benefit Wildground Federation school and Nursery
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
- 22 February 2017: Funds received from 1020287 FRIENDS OF WILDGROUND JUNIOR SCHOOL
- WILDGROUND INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Gahr | Chair | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA MULLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £67.73k | £1.97k | £9.23k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £9.85k | £857 | £5.00k | £5.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2022 | 314 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2022 | 314 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MARCH 2006 as amended on 25 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WILDGROUND INFANT SCHOOL
CRETE ROAD
DIBDEN PURLIEU
SOUTHAMPTON
SO45 4JX
- Phone:
- 02380844001
- Email:
- PTFA@WILDGROUND.HANTS.SCH.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window