Financial history Tramshed Arts

Charity number: 1026883
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £625.00k £526.83k £631.97k £471.64k £419.32k
Total expenditure £695.71k £486.92k £585.60k £612.70k £568.72k
Income from government contracts £29.90k £30.65k N/A N/A £40.08k
Income from government grants £168.03k £172.98k £292.65k £83.84k £99.91k
Income - Donations and legacies £434.26k £32.00k £404.38k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £13.88k £3.59k £26.69k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £176.86k £133.74k £200.90k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £357.49k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £658.86k £454.23k £551.51k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.85k £32.69k £34.09k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £8.93k £9.08k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A