Tramshed Arts

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tramshed uses the arts to build community strength; increasing wellbeing to inspire & equip the next generation in life & creative careers. Tramshed is locally connected & welcoming, working with participants to make transformative programme through excellent quality artistic process & productions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £40,080 from 14 government contract(s) and £99,905 from 3 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
Governance
- 07 October 1993: Standard registration
- TRAMSHED (Working name)
- GREENWICH & LEWISHAM YOUNG PEOPLES THEATRE (Previous name)
- THE GREENWICH YOUNG PEOPLES THEATRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- TRAM SHED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Wilson | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dhononjoy Ray | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amana Charisa Michelle Phillips | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Mary Thackeray | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorena Pelayo Fernandez | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Ann Sage | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Nicole Ferris | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Jackie Smith | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KERRI NEWNS | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN COWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £625.00k | £526.83k | £631.97k | £471.64k | £419.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £695.71k | £486.92k | £585.60k | £612.70k | £568.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.90k | £30.65k | N/A | N/A | £40.08k | |
|
Income from government grants | £168.03k | £172.98k | £292.65k | £83.84k | £99.91k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £434.26k | £32.00k | £404.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £13.88k | £3.59k | £26.69k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £176.86k | £133.74k | £200.90k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £357.49k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £658.86k | £454.23k | £551.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £36.85k | £32.69k | £34.09k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.93k | £9.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 OCTOBER 1971 AS AMENDED 8 DECEMBER 1988 AND 24 APRIL 2006 as amended on 21 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ART OF DRAMA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tramshed
51-53 Woolwich New Road
LONDON
SE18 6ES
- Phone:
- 02088541316
- Email:
- info@tramshed.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window