Financial history ESSEX POLICE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1026884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.66k £23.20k £23.45k £0 £0
Total expenditure £560 £705 £100 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £500 N/A N/A N/A