Financial history BORROW WOOD SCHOOLS' PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £933 £206 £0 £419 £3.15k
Total expenditure £1.14k £0 £123 £3.64k £754
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A