BORROW WOOD SCHOOLS' PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1026897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TALENT SHOWS, DISCOS, SUMMER FAIR, YEAR 6 LEAVERS EVENT, CHRISTMAS FAIR, MAGIC SHOWS, SECRETS ROOMS, LADIES NIGHTS, COFFEE MORNINGS, 100 CLUB AND PRIZE DRAWS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,153
Total expenditure: £754

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1993: Standard registration
  • 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 25 May 2012: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JENNIFER PREEDY Chair 12 January 2024
None on record
Hayley Davies Trustee 10 January 2025
None on record
Jonathan David Storey Trustee 23 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £933 £206 £0 £419 £3.15k
Total expenditure £1.14k £0 £123 £3.64k £754
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Borrow Wood Primary School
Arundel Drive
Spondon
DERBY
DE21 7QW
Phone:
01332 662826
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available