ENDEAVOUR SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1026898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Scouting Activities For Children And Young Adults

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £22,446
Total expenditure: £21,527

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hillingdon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • IST COWLEY SEA SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqui Wallace Trustee 30 September 2024
None on record
William Hermitage Trustee 30 September 2024
None on record
Mark Francis Wallace Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
Simeon Peter Keenan Trustee 16 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.64k £15.80k £28.38k £20.84k £22.45k
Total expenditure £22.33k £14.51k £22.64k £28.22k £21.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £10.00k £9.20k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Austen House
113 High Street
Yiewsley
WEST DRAYTON
Middlesex
UB7 7QL
Phone:
07751762818
Website:

No information available