Accounts and annual returns LITTLE SPROUTS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1026912
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 25 May 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 21 June 2016 On Time